Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Disabled Military Personnel and Surviving Spouses
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Buckel, Cain, Chang, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Harrison, Haynes, Hornberger, Kipke, Krebs, Lopez, McComas, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Qi, Queen, Rose, Shetty, Shoemaker, Solomon, Stewart, Szeliga, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, and Williams
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding eligibility for a certain credit authorized against the county or municipal corporation property tax to include certain members or retired members of the armed forces of the United States and certain surviving spouses; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to provide, by law, for certain eligibility criteria; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0700
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Military Personnel and Surviving Spouses
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 8:43 AM