Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Evidence of Blood Test
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Atterbeary, and B. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Providing that, if a law enforcement officer testifies that the officer witnessed the taking of a blood specimen by a person who the officer reasonably believed was a qualified medical person, the officer's testimony shall be sufficient evidence that the person was a qualified medical person and that the blood was obtained in compliance with specified provisions without testimony by the person who obtained the blood specimen; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1008
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {338076/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 43
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {338076/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Passed Enrolled 72
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page