Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Clippinger, Barkley, Buckel, Carr, Cassilly, Chang, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Jalisi, Jameson, Kelly, Kramer, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Mautz, McComas, Miele, Morhaim, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Power Plant Research Program to conduct a study of regulatory reforms and market incentives that may be necessary or beneficial to increase the use of energy storage devices in the State; requiring the Program to consult with specified entities and interests in conducting the study; prohibiting the cost of the study from exceeding $125,000 per fiscal year; requiring the Program to make its final report and recommend policy actions to specified Committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0715
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683193/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-34)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {467176/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-20)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Favorable with Amendments {683193/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (107-34) 47
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {467176/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (119-20) 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Text - Chapter - Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM