Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor’s Office of Crime Control and Prevention – Crime Firearms – Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to study and compile information regarding certain matters that relate to certain crime firearms; requiring the Department of State Police to provide certain information for the study; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0622
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Crime Firearms - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {912315/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/04 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Crime Firearms - Study
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {912315/1 Adopted 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Motion Special Order until 04/04 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 60
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Text - Third - Governor’s Office of Crime Control and Prevention – Crime Firearms – Study
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM