Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Adverse Childhood Experience Screening – Requirement and Practitioner Training Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a certain physical examination to include a certain screening for adverse childhood experiences beginning with children entering the public school system in the 2022-2023 school year; requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to a certain limitation and as permitted by federal law, to provide reimbursement to a licensed physician, licensed physician assistant, or certified registered nurse practitioner who provides a certain screening under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health – Adverse Childhood Experience Screening – Requirement and Practitioner Training Program
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/11/2021 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page