Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Anderson, Cain, Cardin, Chang, J. Lewis, Lierman, Moon, Shetty, and Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility for the filing of a certain motion to vacate judgment if the person's participation in the offense was a direct result of being a victim of human trafficking; requiring that a certain motion be served on a certain State's Attorney; requiring that a certain motion be mailed to a victim or victim's representative at a certain address if the qualifying offense occurred within 5 years before the filing of the motion; requiring the court to take certain factors into consideration when making a certain finding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0691
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {102512/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-7)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {102512/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (131-7) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 8-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM