Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recreational Fishing Licenses - Duration and Expiration Date
Sponsored by
Delegates Flanagan, Frush, Lafferty, Mautz, O'Donnell, Szeliga, Anderton, Carr, Cassilly, Fraser-Hidalgo, Jacobs, and Jalisi
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the expiration date for and, under specified circumstances, the duration of specified recreational fishing licenses; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish by regulation a term for a specified recreational fishing license; and requiring the Department to proportionally prorate the annual license fees for specified recreational fishing licenses.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0666
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {220510/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714439/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Delegates Stein, Frush, and Flanagan
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Senators Bates, Kagan, and Simonaire
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable with Amendments {220510/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 45
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
Senate 4/06/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {714439/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 58
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Requests Senate Recede 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Delegates Stein, Frush, and Flanagan 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senate Refuses to Recede 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senators Bates, Kagan, and Simonaire 60
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 66
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 66
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/11/2015 4/05/2015 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-210.1, 4-216, 4-604, 4-745 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM