Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Arikan, Barron, Bromwell, Cardin, Guyton, Hettleman, J. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, and McComas
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that persons who are required to provide notice of suspected child abuse or neglect of a child or make a written report of suspected child abuse or neglect may not knowingly fail to provide the required notice or make the written report if the person has actual knowledge of the abuse or neglect; establishing that a violation of the Act is a misdemeanor; providing certain penalties; and applying the Act only to a failure to report child abuse or neglect that occurs during the time the child is a minor.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {782517/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {858274/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, W. Fisher and Grammer)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, W. Fisher and Grammer)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {782517/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {858274/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 59A
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, W. Fisher and Grammer) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Hough) Adopted 62A
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, W. Fisher and Grammer) 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Senate Recede 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Recede 67
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Text - Chapter - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-602.2 )
(   5-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM