Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
Sponsored by
Washington County Delegation
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a special event permit in Washington County; authorizing a holder of a Class 3 winery license or a Class 4 limited winery license in the county to sell beer, wine produced by the holder, certain sparkling wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption at certain events under the permit; requiring a license holder to purchase certain alcoholic beverages from a licensed retailer; requiring the license holder to keep receipts of purchase of alcoholic beverages for 1 year after the date of purchase; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {213295/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {753428/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (43-0)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {213295/1 Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49A
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Floor Amendment {753428/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (43-0) 53A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/30/2020 2:45 PM