Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement – Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Reserve Program and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
Sponsored by
Delegate P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the Small Business Reserve Program includes certain veteran-owned small business enterprises that meet certain criteria; requiring the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to adopt regulations to establish a certain overall percentage goal of certain procurement contracts to be made with veteran-owned small business enterprises; requiring certain solicitation documents to include certain information; altering the required contents of a certain annual report; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0598
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Procurement – Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Reserve Program and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Procurement – Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Reserve Program and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Returned Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Text - Chapter - Procurement – Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Reserve Program and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:15 PM
Click to return on the top page