Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County to $125,000, from $110,000, beginning December 6, 2022 and to $140,000 beginning December 5, 2023, and thereafter; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary of the incumbent Sheriff.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0613
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 9:06 PM
Click to return on the top page