Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsored by
Delegates Branch and Glenn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing for enhanced workers' compensation benefits for a Baltimore City deputy sheriff for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than a certain number of weeks; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0349
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783597/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Provision of Medical Services and Treatment - Notification to Seek Treatment
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {783597/1 Adopted 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 56
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Referred Rules 58
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator McCray) Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Text - Chapter - Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-628, 9-629 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM