Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Lewis and Morhaim
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a provision of law to specify that a person who is experiencing a medical emergency, rather than a person who reasonably believes that the person is experiencing a medical emergency, after ingesting or using alcohol or drugs is immune from criminal arrest, charge, or prosecution for a certain violation if the evidence for the arrest, charge, or prosecution was obtained solely as a result of the person seeking or receiving medical assistance; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0625
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 37
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM