Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, McDonough, Metzgar, Morales, Pendergrass, Platt, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 710
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, under certain circumstances, that a dentist who is a faculty member at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry and was trained at a foreign dental school be qualified by the State Board of Dental Examiners to take a certain examination; authorizing a dentist who passes a certain examination to apply for a general license to practice dentistry; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0934
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {956487/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 710
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {956487/1 Adopted 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 710
Text - Chapter - State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-302, 4-306, 4-306.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM