Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Beitzel, Buckel, and McKay
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the purpose and use of the State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2020 and each fiscal year thereafter, to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $1,000,000 to the Fund; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2021, on the status of the Fund and any recommendations for the fund; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0501
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {980210/2 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Alterations
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {980210/2 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Text - Third - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Alterations
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Referred Rules 65
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-205, 8-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM