Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Crutchfield, Acevero, Anderson, Bartlett, Cardin, Conaway, D.M. Davis, W. Fisher, J. Lewis, Lopez, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, R. Watson, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of the Division of Correction to operate a comprehensive rehabilitative prerelease facility for female inmates; requiring that a certain prerelease facility be located in Baltimore City; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to complete certain phases of a certain project by certain dates; requiring the Commissioner to provide evidence-based and gender-responsive prerelease services for female inmates; requiring the Department to provide certain updates to certain committees; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0684
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {872411/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-31)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {368472/1
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {368472/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Washington) (31-14) Rejected
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {872411/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (101-31) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {368472/1 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Committee Amendment {368472/1 Adopted 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Washington) (31-14) Rejected 53CClick to view Recorded Media
(   3-301, 3-303 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page