Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsored by
Calvert County Delegation
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Calvert County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $33,810,000 to finance the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in Calvert County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0458
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 41
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM