Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County and Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Use of Local Impact Grants
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Beitzel, and McKay
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that at least 20% of the local impact grants distributed to Allegany County from specified proceeds of video lottery terminals be used for capital projects for municipalities and nonprofit organizations in the county; and requiring that an annual amount of $125,000 of the local impact grants in Prince George's County from specified proceeds of video lottery terminals be used in communities within 2.5 miles northeast of the video lottery facility in the county.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0663
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Allegany County - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensee
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {565667/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {393929/2 (Senator Muse)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {393929/2 (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Allegany County - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensee
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {565667/1 Adopted 61
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Use of Local Impact Grants
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules 59
Senate 4/05/2017 4/06/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {393929/2 (Senator Muse) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Floor Amendment {393929/2 (Senator Muse) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Allegany County and Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Use of Local Impact Grants
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Text - Chapter - Allegany County and Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Use of Local Impact Grants
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM