Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Buckel, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency from allowing the establishment of any system or program that allows a person to purchase a State lottery ticket through an electronic device that connects to the Internet such as a personal computer or mobile device.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0438
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 9:30 PM (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
Text - Third - State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 61
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Referred Rules 57
Senate 4/05/2017 4/06/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Special Order until 9:30 PM (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (37-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Text - Chapter - State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-101, 9-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM