Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and Bidding
Sponsored by
Calvert County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the minimum dollar amount of contracts from $15,000 to $30,000 for which the Calvert County Commissioners are required to undergo a formal bidding process; requiring a certain contract to be awarded to the most responsible offeror under certain circumstances; requiring certain emergency purchases by the County Commissioners to be published in certain newspapers for two weeks; and requiring certain contracts of duration longer than 1 year to be structured as a certain option contract.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and Bidding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {210910/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and Bidding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and Bidding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and Bidding
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {210910/1 Adopted 46A
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46A
Text - Third - Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and Bidding
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48C
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and Bidding
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-101, 6-102, 6-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM