Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegate Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that certain provisions of law concerning the method of calculating a certain reduction in the State agricultural land transfer tax apply to a transfer under a contract of sale dated on or after July 1, 2019; clarifying that a certain exemption from the State agricultural land transfer tax applies to a transfer under a contract of sale dated on or after July 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1609 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Reassigned to Ways and Means
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Reassigned to Ways and Means 8 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page