Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a provision in the declaration of a condominium or in a governing document of a homeowners association that requires any action on the part of a holder of a mortgage or deed of trust on a unit or a lot in order to make certain amendments shall be deemed satisfied if certain procedures are satisfied under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-103, 11B-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM