Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Dispute Settlement
Sponsored by
Delegate Healey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the procedures a council of unit owners or a board of directors of a condominium shall take before a penalty for a violation of the rules of the condominium can be imposed on an alleged violator; altering the procedures a council of unit owners or a board of directors shall take if an alleged violator does not comply with a certain written demand to cease and desist in a certain period of time; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0392 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Dispute Settlement
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Dispute Settlement
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:15 PM
Click to return on the top page