Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect – Sex Trafficking – Services and Investigations (Child Sex Trafficking Screening and Services Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Attar, Atterbeary, Cain, Chang, W. Fisher, Hettleman, Kelly, Korman, Lopez, Love, Mosby, Sample-Hughes, Solomon, J. Lewis, Moon, Cardin, Grammer, Crutchfield, McComas, Pippy, Arikan, Shetty, and Cox
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement officer who suspects that a child that has been detained is a victim of sex trafficking to notify a regional navigator; requiring a local department of social services that receives a report of suspected child abuse or neglect to refer the child to a regional navigator for services; establishing the Safe Harbor Regional Navigator Grant Program to support services for youth victims of sex trafficking; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to provide funding by October 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0688
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {592618/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Lee) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Juvenile Law – Sex Trafficking – Immunity, Services, and Investigations (Child Sex Trafficking Screening and Services Act of 2019)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {592618/1 Adopted 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46A
Text - Third - Child Abuse and Neglect – Sex Trafficking – Services and Investigations (Child Sex Trafficking Screening and Services Act of 2019)
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Lee) Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Text - Chapter - Child Abuse and Neglect – Sex Trafficking – Services and Investigations (Child Sex Trafficking Screening and Services Act of 2019)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-704.3, 5-704.4, 5-706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM