Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Washington, Ali, Beidle, Clippinger, Cullison, Ebersole, Frick, Frush, Hettleman, Jones, Kelly, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McMillan, Moon, and Reznik
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 746
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a municipality from requiring an individual to provide a reason that the individual will be unable to vote in person on election day in order to vote by absentee ballot.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0730
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0025 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-11)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 746
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33
Text - Third - Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 35
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 36
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (35-11) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 746
Text - Chapter -
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM