Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, B. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Carr, Charles, Cullison, Fennell, Hettleman, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Proctor, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Valentino-Smith, K. Young, Pendergrass, Bagnall, Bhandari, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Metzgar, Morgan, Saab, and Szeliga
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from denying an individual access to a home- and community-based services waiver due to a lack of funding for waiver services if the individual is living at home or in the community at a certain time, received certain services, will be or has been terminated from the Maryland Medical Assistance Program due to certain entitlement or enrollment, meets certain eligibility criteria, and certain services received by the individual would qualify for federal matching funds.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0699
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {516780/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {516780/1 Adopted 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Referred Rules 62A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM