Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Vocational and Technical Education Programs in Harford County
Sponsored by
Delegate James
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Vocational and Technical Education Programs in Harford County; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force, in consultation with a specified committee, to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the Harford County Executive, the Harford County Board of Education, and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2014; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {585464/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments {585464/1 Report Adopted 42
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 43
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41A
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM