Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Acevero, Hettleman, Krimm, Lierman, Solomon, Terrasa, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the food stamp program to be the food supplement program; establishing a Restaurant Meals Program (RMP) within the food supplement program in the Department of Human Services to expand food access to certain individuals; authorizing a certain household eligible to participate in the RMP if the household is eligible for certain State and federal benefits and lacks a fixed, regular, and adequate nighttime residence and includes certain persons; requiring a restaurant to meet certain requirements to participate; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0752
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604461/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/08 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-37)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {604461/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/08 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (99-37) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Finance 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Text - Chapter - Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
(   5-501, 5-503, 5-504, 5-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page