Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Barve, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Krimm, Lafferty, Luedtke, Platt, and Turner
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from stopping, standing, or parking a vehicle that is not a plug-in electric drive vehicle in a parking space that is designated for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles; requiring that a parking space that is for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles have green pavement markings; requiring that a parking space that is for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles be counted as part of the overall number of parking spaces for purposes of complying with specified zoning or parking laws; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {850318/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-19)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {850318/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (114-19) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-145.1, 21-1003.2, 27-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM