Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Acevero, Chang, Corderman, Jackson, and McKay
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Central Home Detention Unit of the Division of Parole and Probation; authorizing the Director of the Division of Parole and Probation to authorize certain employees of the Central Home Detention Unit to exercise certain powers, including executing warrants for the retaking or arrest of certain offenders and executing search warrants; requiring an employee of the Central Home Detention Unit to meet certain minimum qualifications and training of the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0779
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46A
Text - Third - Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-101, 3-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM