Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - State Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates Hornberger, Anderton, Arikan, Boteler, Buckel, Chisholm, Corderman, Hartman, McComas, Rose, and Saab
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain law enforcement officers to include State law enforcement officers who reside in the political subdivision in which the law enforcement officer is employed with a crime rate that exceeds the State's crime rate; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0492
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - State Law Enforcement Officers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - State Law Enforcement Officers
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:08 PM