Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools – School Psychologists – Reports
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly, Anderton, Arikan, Buckel, Cassilly, Guyton, Hornberger, Kaiser, Luedtke, McComas, Rose, Walker, and Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each local school system in the State to submit an interim report on the ratio of students to psychologists in each school, strategies to increase the number of psychologists, policies to decrease wait times, and strategies to increase retention of qualified psychologists to the State Board of Education, the Governor, and certain legislative committees by July 1, 2020; requiring each local school system in the State to submit a final report on school psychologists to the State Board by December 1, 2020; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools – School Psychologists – Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {695069/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools – School Psychologists – Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Schools – School Psychologists – Reports
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools – School Psychologists – Reports
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {695069/1 Adopted 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Public Schools – School Psychologists – Reports
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 56
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Text - Chapter - Public Schools – School Psychologists – Reports
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM