Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension Systems - Cost-of-Living Adjustments - Simplification and Clarification
Sponsored by
Delegate Griffith (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the calculation of cost-of-living adjustments for specified State retirement or pension systems; clarifying the applicability of specified cost-of-living adjustments to specified State retirement or pension systems and to specified participants in those systems; consolidating provisions relating to cost-of-living adjustments that apply to all of the cost-of-living adjustments; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the purpose of the Act is to clarify, and not to substantively alter benefits; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0801
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {644069/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {644069/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 41
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-113, 22-219, 22-220, 22-221, 23-218, 23-226, 24-401, 24-401.1, 26-210, 26-401.1, 29-401 through 29-409, 29-401 through 29-432 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM