Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Chain of Custody and Reuse
Sponsored by
Delegate Lehman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a certain producer of synthetic turf and turf infill to establish a system to track the chain of custody of the synthetic turf and turf infill from their manufacture to their reuse, recycling, and final disposal on or before January 1, 2022, subject to a certain exception; requiring a certain owner of synthetic turf and turf infill to establish a system to track the chain of custody of the synthetic turf and turf infill from their use to their reuse, recycling, and final disposal under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2021
Legislative Date
2/07/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Chain of Custody and Reuse
House 2/07/2021 2/07/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
(   9-2301 through 9-2304 )
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 10:05 AM
Click to return on the top page