Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Fisher, Adams, Arentz, Buckel, Chisholm, Clark, Corderman, Ghrist, Hartman, Hornberger, Howard, Jacobs, Jalisi, Malone, McComas, Morgan, Otto, Saab, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting business personal property from the property tax imposed by a county or municipal corporation, subject to certain exceptions; requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to identify certain provisions of law and submit a certain report to the General Assembly; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0374 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM