Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Town of Kensington MC 15-20
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing, in the Town of Kensington in Montgomery County, the Board of License Commissioners for Montgomery County to provide for a beer and wine tasting (BWT) license; repealing a limitation on the number of beer and wine tasting licenses in Kensington that the Board may issue; authorizing the issuance of not more than four Class 9 limited distillery licenses for use in the town; authorizing the Board to alter the number of Class A-K license holders under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Town of Kensington MC 15-20
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {603194/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Town of Kensington MC 15-20
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Town of Kensington MC 15-20
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {603194/1 Adopted 47
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Town of Kensington MC 15-20
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53B
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 9:08 AM