Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Anderson, Angel, Carr, Conaway, Dumais, Gaines, Glenn, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Jackson, Jones, R. Lewis, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Reznik, Rosenberg, Sydnor, Valentino-Smith, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law subjecting individuals convicted of specified felonies involving a controlled dangerous substance who apply for temporary cash assistance or food stamps to specified testing and treatment requirements and sanctions; altering the criminal violations that make specified recipients ineligible for temporary cash assistance or food stamps for 1 year after conviction and subject to specified testing and treatment requirements and sanctions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0853
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {144460/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (83-52)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {287476/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-55)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {144460/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 44
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Alteration of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (83-52) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Finance 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {287476/1 Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 57
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (84-55) 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
Text - Chapter - Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM