Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class BNR License – Newly Opened Restaurant
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring food sales to exceed 40% of the average daily receipts from the sale of beer, wine, and liquor for a Class BNR license in Harford County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0383
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class BNR License – Newly Opened Restaurant
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class BNR License – Newly Opened Restaurant
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-102, 22-906 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:09 PM