Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Charles
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 785
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans to provide funds to local nonprofit organizations to establish and expand community behavioral health programs to serve members, veterans, and their families; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to administer the Program and to establish a statewide system to assess the services provided by the nonprofit organizations; authorizing the Governor to provide $2,500,000 in the annual budget bill for the Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0550
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1515 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 785
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans - Establishment
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans - Establishment
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Finance Budget and Taxation 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Returned Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 785
Text - Chapter - Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans - Establishment
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page