Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Beitzel, Hornberger, Krebs, Long, Reilly, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness; specifying the membership of the Task Force; providing for the appointment of a Senate cochair and House cochair of the Task Force; providing for the staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations on potential changes to the State's revenue structure to promote development, ensure fairness, and create a business-friendly environment to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Task Force on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM