Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Special Elections - Absentee Ballots for Absent Uniformed Services Voters and Overseas Voters
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Luedtke, Hixson, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a county council to set the date for a special election to fill a vacancy in specified county offices so that the local board of elections may provide absentee ballots for that election to absent uniformed services voters and overseas voters at least 45 days before the special election; requiring the State Administrator of Elections to require local boards of elections to provide absentee ballots for a special election to fill a vacancy in Congress to absent uniformed services voters and overseas voters 45 days before the election; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {775365/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {775365/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/14/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43A
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 61A
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-401, 8-710 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM