Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Purple Line Marketing Program (Purple Line Marketing Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, B. Barnes, and W. Fisher
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration, in partnership with certain stakeholders, to develop and implement a Purple Line marketing plan designed to generate early interest in and promote use of the Purple Line; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill $1,000,000 from the Transportation Trust Fund for the marketing plan in fiscal years 2021 through 2024; requiring the Administration, by December 31, 2020, 2021, and 2022, to submit a certain report to certain standing committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0668
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Transportation - Purple Line Marketing Program (Purple Line Marketing Act)
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 9:36 AM