Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Store Credit Cards for Rebates and Returned Merchandise - Required Notice
Sponsored by
Delegates V. Turner, Cullison, Elliott, Hubbard, Murphy, and Reznik
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a merchant from requiring a consumer to accept a store credit card, instead of cash, a check, or a credit to the consumer's credit or debit card account, for a rebate or returned merchandise unless the merchant displays at the point of sale a notice disclosing in a specified manner a specified policy of the merchant; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-33)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (104-33) 42
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Finance 41
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1319.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM