Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Family Member - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates Kerr, Acevero, Carr, Charles, Cullison, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Johnson, Kelly, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Stewart, Terrasa, Valderrama, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "family member" for purposes of the Maryland Healthy Working Families Act to include a legal ward of an employee, a legal ward of an employee's spouse, or a legal guardian of an employee's spouse.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Family Member - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Family Member - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-23)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Family Member - Definition
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable Adopted 40
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Family Member - Definition
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (115-23) 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Finance 42
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 9:02 AM