Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Parking
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti, Cassilly, McComas, and Reilly
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, to the extent appropriate and practicable, that each early voting center have sufficient parking on-site to accommodate voters who are expected to drive to the early voting center.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0096
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {275265/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {275265/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM