Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Carr, Angel, Cullison, Hill, Kelly, R. Lewis, Morgan, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Tarlau, K. Young, and Krebs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Open Meetings Law Compliance Board, in conjunction with the Office of the Attorney General, to develop and conduct educational programs and distribute educational materials on the requirements of the open meetings law to the staff and attorneys of specified entities; requiring the Board to post specified information on violators of the Act on a specified Web site; prohibiting a public body from meeting in closed session except under specified circumstances; establishing specified reporting requirements; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0450
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Open Meetings Act - Required Training for Members of Public Bodies
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {916087/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {724638/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Open Meetings Act - Required Training for Members of Public Bodies
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {916087/1 Adopted 48
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {724638/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text - Chapter - Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-101, 3-204, 3-211, 3-213 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM