Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health Facilities - Sexual Abuse and Harassment - Reporting and Prevention
Sponsored by
Delegate Valentino-Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring residential treatment facilities to report complaints of sexual abuse and sexual harassment within 24 hours of receiving the complaint to the Behavioral Health Administration, the Office of Health Care Quality, or in the case of a minor, to Child Protective Services; requiring the Office and the Administration to develop and implement a certain reporting system; requiring facilities to develop and implement policies and procedures for responding to complaints of sexual abuse and harassment; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0815
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {886488/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Mental Health Facilities - Sexual Abuse and Harassment - Reporting and Prevention
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {886488/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Mental Health Facilities - Sexual Abuse and Harassment - Reporting and Prevention
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Finance 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Text - Chapter - Mental Health Facilities - Sexual Abuse and Harassment - Reporting and Prevention
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:36 PM
Click to return on the top page