Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0889


CH0634

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
Sponsored by
Delegates Bagnall, Chang, and Howard
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Exempting from the property tax property that is owned by the Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc., and used exclusively for education of the public, encouraging agriculture in the State, assisting in the dissemination of information relating to agriculture, or the maintenance of a natural or recreational area for public use; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0802
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Moon) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Moon) Adopted 48A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 49B
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 49B
Text - Third - Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 51A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:37 PM