Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   HB0891 - 2019RS
   CH0006 - 2020RS
Title
State Personnel - Grievance Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Hettleman, Jackson, Krimm, Reznik, and Valentino-Smith
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 6 of 2020
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the application of provisions of law governing grievance procedures for certain employees; requiring a grievant to complete certain forms in sufficient detail that will allow for the expeditious resolution of the grievance; applying a certain definition of "grievance" to a certain requirement that the Department of Transportation adopt certain regulations relating to employee grievance procedures; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0289
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0335 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Personnel - Grievance Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Personnel - Grievance Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-38)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {597675/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-37)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Personnel - Grievance Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/21 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Veto overridden (96-41)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Veto overridden (31-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 6 of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Grievance Procedures
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - State Personnel - Grievance Procedures
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-38) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {597675/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-37) 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Personnel - Grievance Procedures
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/21 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Veto overridden (96-41)
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Veto overridden (31-15)
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 6 of 2020
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-102, 12-108 )
(   2-103.4 )
Last Updated: 2/12/2020 11:33 AM