Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act – Motor Vehicle Administration – Warrant for Personal Information and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Acevero, Atterbeary, Carr, Charkoudian, Charles, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Forbes, Gilchrist, Hettleman, Ivey, M. Jackson, Kaiser, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Queen, Rosenberg, Shetty, Stewart, Terrasa, Turner, Valderrama, Wells, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a custodian of records for the Motor Vehicle Administration to deny inspection by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement of the part of a public record that contains personal information unless the custodian is provided with a valid warrant issued by a federal court or a court of this State; and requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to annually report information on the number of certain requests from a certain U.S. agency to the General Assembly on or before June 1, 2022, and each June 1 thereafter; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0649
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Text - First - Public Information Act – Motor Vehicle Administration – Warrant for Personal Information and Reporting
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 9:36 AM